McFarlane, Nicholas Andrew (CPSO#: 68745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 313
751 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E5
Phone: (519) 954-2370
Fax: (519) 954-8560
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas McFarlane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. McFarlane ( CPSO# 68745 )

Business Address:
Suite 313
751 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 954-2370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ANDREW MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000