McGarry, Ursula Mary (CPSO#: 62717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370 Ext. 4034
Fax: (613) 256-0949
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ursula McGarry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. U. McGarry ( CPSO# 62717 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-9370

Business Address:
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-9370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. URSULA MARY MCGARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGARRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1993