Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McGillivray, Daniel Lachlan (CPSO#: 59741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3497 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7N 2R4
Phone: (905) 681-6809
Fax: (905) 681-6207
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel McGillivray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McGillivray ( CPSO# 59741 )

Business Address:
3497 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7N 2R4
Phone Number: (905) 681-6809

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL LACHLAN MCGILLIVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILLIVRAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989