Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McGregor, Caitlin Tamora (CPSO#: 70337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room MG130A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4353
Fax: (416) 480-5855
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caitlin McGregor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Women's College HSC
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG130A
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4353

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. M. Haider ( CPSO# 57221 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAITLIN TAMORA MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2002