McGugan, John Alexander (CPSO#: 66800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Belleville
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UCosmetic
1324 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7M 3E2
Canada
Phone: (613) 536-5277
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John A. McGugan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGugan ( CPSO# 66800 )

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER MCGUGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1996