McIntosh, Kimberley Ann (CPSO#: 73578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 323-9800
Fax: (705) 323-9601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. McIntosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McIntosh ( CPSO# 73578 )

Business Address:
204 - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 323-9800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ANN MCINTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 25 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2001