McIntyre, Christopher William (CPSO#: 104923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8028
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher W. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McIntyre ( CPSO# 104923)

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 16 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Christopher William McIntyre may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Nephrology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
                        McIntyre holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. McIntyre
                  no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.