McIver, Colin Hamish (CPSO#: 31778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2283
Fax: (519) 372-3954
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colin McIver, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McIver ( CPSO# 31778 )
Dr. K. Connelly ( CPSO# 50285 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000


Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saab ( CPSO# 81104 )
Dr. N. Rosta ( CPSO# 67897 )
Dr. C. McIver ( CPSO# 31778 )
Dr. L. Howlett ( CPSO# 68288 )
Dr. R. Hawkes ( CPSO# 77933 )
Dr. F. Greaves ( CPSO# 31954 )
Dr. C. Baldauf ( CPSO# 72518 )
Dr. S. Drover ( CPSO# 82776 )
Dr. S. Thomson ( CPSO# 57552 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN HAMISH MCIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCIVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1980