McKee, David Clifford (CPSO#: 69709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakehead University Sports Medicine
Clinic
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8936
Fax: (807) 766-7226
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David McKee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McKee ( CPSO# 69709 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Business Address:
300 Lillie Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 4Y7
Phone Number: (807) 623-7677

Business Address:
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 344-8936

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CLIFFORD MCKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1995