McKenna, Joseph Patrick (CPSO#: 19159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1964

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1964

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rudd Clinic
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-0997
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH PATRICK MCKENNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKENNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1964