McKenzie, Kim Robert (CPSO#: 72978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
121 Wellington Street West
Suite 214
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone: (705) 733-4061
Fax: (705) 733-4063
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.R. McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2009


Corporation Name: K.R. McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKenzie ( CPSO# 72978 )

Business Address:
214 - 121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 733-4061

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 26, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kim Robert McKenzie
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. McKenzie to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. KIM ROBERT MCKENZIE
                                           ("Dr. McKenzie")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. McKenzie, certificate of registration number 72978, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that the College received information which
                  raised concerns regarding his office-based geriatrics practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        assessor dated February 22, 2017, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   the University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping Course, or
                              another program(s) satisfactory to the College in medical
                              record keeping; and
                  
                        (ii)  review and prepare a written report acceptable to the College
                              on the issue of driving safety in patients with dementia; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months of the Effective Date.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the
                        "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McKenzie, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McKenzie, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McKenzie, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information that raised concerns regarding Dr.
                        McKenzie's office-based geriatrics practice. As a result:
                  
                              "Dr. McKenzie will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                              "Dr. McKenzie will engage in professional education in
                              medical recordkeeping and driving safety in patients with
                              dementia.
                  
                              "Dr. McKenzie's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. McKenzie, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following
                  information to any person who requires this information for the purposes
                  of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:
                  
                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. McKenzie, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my 
                  compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. McKenzie, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 26, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kim Robert McKenzie to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 26, 2017:

The College received information that raised concerns regarding Dr. McKenzie’s office-based geriatrics practice. As a result:

Dr. McKenzie will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. McKenzie will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and driving safety in patients with dementia.

Dr. McKenzie’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.