McKillop, Graeme John (CPSO#: 68802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: (613) 256-0949
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McKillop Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. McKillop ( CPSO# 68802 )
Dr. J. Davis ( CPSO# 71081 )

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2567

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Department of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME JOHN MCKILLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKILLOP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997