McKinney, Brock Paul (CPSO#: 88528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
16 O Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 558-2020
Fax: (705) 558-3030
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brock McKinney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McKinney ( CPSO# 88528 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 558-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BROCK PAUL MCKINNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013