McKinney, Kevin Geruard (CPSO#: 78659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Westmore, Suite 101A
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Phone: (416) 744-2221
Fax: (416) 745-2225
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shantel Minnis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKinney ( CPSO# 78659 )
Dr. S. Minnis ( CPSO# 78510 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210


Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin McKinney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKinney ( CPSO# 78659 )
Dr. S. Minnis ( CPSO# 78510 )

Business Address:
101A - 40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 744-2221

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bahamas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN GERUARD MCKINNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 05 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2012