McLachlin, Catherine Margaret (CPSO#: 58284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
A3-150
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 865-8500 Ext. 36346
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.M. McLachlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McLachlin ( CPSO# 58284 )

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
A3 - 150
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 860-2033

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARGARET MCLACHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLACHLIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988