McLean, Hugh Allen (CPSO#: 28323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Suite 343
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone: (905) 273-4888
Fax: (905) 273-5581
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh A. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. McLean ( CPSO# 28323 )

Business Address:
Suite 343
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (905) 273-4888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH ALLEN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976