McLean, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 54360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Parent Resource Inst
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thames Valley Children's Center
779 Baseline Road East
London ON  N6C 5Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

LHSC, 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLean and Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walker ( CPSO# 57634 )
Dr. J. McLean ( CPSO# 54360 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Child and Parent Resource Inst
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 858-2774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2011