McLellan, Catherine Susan (CPSO#: 69202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CV Lab Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1329
Fax: (613) 548-2400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.S. McLellan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McLellan ( CPSO# 69202 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kidd 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-1329

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE SUSAN MCLELLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLELLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999