McMillan, Richard William (CPSO#: 68924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 685-1381 Ext. 85306
Fax: (905) 687-3244
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard W. McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McMillan ( CPSO# 68924 )

Business Address:
Niagara Rehab
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999