McMillan, Sharon Kim (CPSO#: 51177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C2
Phone: (905) 648-1517
Fax: (905) 648-0777
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Kim McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McMillan ( CPSO# 51177 )
Dr. K. Giles ( CPSO# 95700 )

Business Address:
326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C2
Phone Number: (905) 648-1517

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON KIM MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1985