McNabb, Jamie Alexander Hugh Morgan (CPSO#: 69173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 William Street South
Suite #2
Lindsay ON  K9V 3A3
Phone: (705) 324-8197
Fax: (705) 324-8557
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. A. McNabb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McNabb ( CPSO# 69173 )

Business Address:
2 - 1 William Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 3A3
Phone Number: (705) 324-8197

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6191

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE ALEXANDER HUGH MORGAN MCNABB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNABB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000