McNaught, Andrew Fraser (CPSO#: 88015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew McNaught Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McNaught ( CPSO# 88015 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW FRASER MCNAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012