McNeil, Ceara Jean (CPSO#: 86598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inmedic Pain Management Clinic
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inmedic Pain Management Clinic
110-525 Belmont Ave W.
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-9257
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ceara J. McNeil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McNeil ( CPSO# 86598 )

Business Address:
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Business Address:
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CEARA JEAN MCNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010