McNeill, Brian Rodger (CPSO#: 51180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Hillcrest Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5P 2J8
Phone: (519) 633-6610
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
PO Box 2007
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2030 Ext. 2063
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. McNeill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McNeill ( CPSO# 51180 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN RODGER MCNEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1985 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jun 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983