McPhaden, John Malcolm (CPSO#: 54132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 118
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 815-8914
Fax: (905) 815-8920
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John McPhaden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McPhaden ( CPSO# 54132 )
Dr. M. Kim ( CPSO# 53952 )

Business Address:
Suite 118
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 815-8914

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MALCOLM MCPHADEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHADEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1985