Medline, Paul Brian (CPSO#: 62366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gamma Dynacare Medical Laboratories
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Fax: (905) 790-2990
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Medline Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Medline ( CPSO# 62366 )

Business Address:
Gamma Dynacare Medical Laboratories
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL BRIAN MEDLINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDLINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991