Meeder, Robert Johan Jan (CPSO#: 73406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Paediatric Teaching Assoc
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone: (705) 330-3202
Fax: (705) 327-9189
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meeder Zacharias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zacharias ( CPSO# 73550 )
Dr. R. Meeder ( CPSO# 73406 )

Business Address:
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colbourne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Orillia Paediatric Teaching Assoc
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHAN JAN MEEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEEDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003