Meehan, Anne Rankin (CPSO#: 57339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
2530 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1G1
Phone: (613) 830-5888
Fax: (613) 830-1791
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Meehan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meehan ( CPSO# 57339 )

Business Address:
1 - 2530 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 830-5888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE RANKIN MEEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEEHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1988 to 30 Sep 1988
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1988