Mehta, Chaula Ashish (CPSO#: 96646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TRIO Fertility Centre
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 972-0110
Fax: (647) 689-2182
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaula Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mehta ( CPSO# 96646 )

Business Address:
TRIO Fertility Clinic
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 824-6466

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAULA ASHISH MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016