Mehta, Damini (CPSO#: 67954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1996


Former Name: Radia, Damini (used until: 22 Oct 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: (905) 893-8218
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Damini Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2008

Dr. D. Mehta ( CPSO# 67954 )

Business Address:
Suite A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAMINI MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1996