Mehta, Navdeep (CPSO#: 62628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Center
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Fax: (705) 671-7372
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navdeep Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mehta ( CPSO# 62628 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Suite 3417
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]

            As from August 19, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Navdeep Mehta, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mehta to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                           DR. NAVDEEP MEHTA
                                             ("Dr. Mehta")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mehta, certificate of registration number 62628, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge that I entered into an Undertaking to the
                  College on June 4, 2015 (the "Original Undertaking") as a result of a
                  reassessment of my nephrology practice, and that I continue to be subject
                  to the Original Undertaking except as specifically set out in this
                  undertaking (the "2016 Undertaking").  

            (4)   I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge that the purpose of this 2016 Undertaking is to
                  extend the period of time during which my behaviour in the workplace will
                  be monitored by a further one-year period, as a result of information
                  received from my Workplace Monitor to date.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Mehta, undertake and acknowledge that paragraphs B(14) and B(15)
                  of my Original Undertaking are hereby replaced by paragraphs B(7) and
                  B(8) of this my 2016 Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Mehta, undertake to have my Chief of Staff, the Chief of Critical
                  Care and/or Nephrology or a person in a similar position approved by the
                  College (my "Workplace Monitor") assist in the monitoring of my behaviour
                  in the workplace at each of my Practice Locations for a period of three
                  years commencing from the date that I signed the Original Undertaking,
                  which was June 4, 2015, such obligation to cease in respect of a
                  particular Practice Location should I cease to practise there during the
                  three year period. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge that I have reviewed my Workplace Monitor's
                  undertaking at Appendix "B" to the Original Undertaking and the
                  supplemental Workplace Monitor's undertaking at Appendix "A" to this 2016
                  Undertaking, and understand what is required of my Workplace Monitor,
                  including, without limiting the generality of the foregoing: 

                  (a)   Written reports to the College every six months for three (3)
                        years;
                  
                  (b)   Such reports to include at least the following information: (a) a
                        review of my interpersonal conduct, behaviour and professionalism
                        in the workplace; (b) a review of any concerns that have come to my
                        workplace monitor's attention regarding my patient care; and (c)
                        details of any complaints received from patients, families, staff
                        and/or others regarding my behaviour in the workplace; and
                  
                  (c)   Immediate reporting to the College if the Workplace Monitor has any
                        concerns: about my conduct, behaviour, professionalism or care;
                        that my patients may be at risk of harm or injury; or that I am not
                        in compliance with my Original Undertaking or my 2016 Undertaking. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Mehta, undertake to comply with my 2016 Undertaking and
                  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of my 2016 Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
                  may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Mehta, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Mehta entered into an Undertaking to the College on June 4,
                        2015 (the "Original Undertaking") as a result of a reassessment of
                        his nephrology practice.  Among other things Original Undertaking
                        required monitoring of Dr. Mehta's behaviour in the workplace for a
                        period of two years by a Workplace Monitor approved by the College.
                        As a result of information received from his Workplace Monitor, Dr.
                        Mehta has agreed to extend the period of time during which the
                        Workplace Monitor will monitor his behaviour in the workplace to
                        three years from the date of the Original Undertaking.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Mehta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any
                  person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order
                  for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of my 2016
                  Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Mehta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide my
                  2016 Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any hospital or Practice Location where I practise
                  or have privileges ("Chief of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of
                  Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances
                  of my entering into this 2016 Undertaking and/or any information arising
                  from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.  

            (17)  I, Dr. Mehta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Workplace Monitors: 

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking; 
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking. 
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Mehta, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of any professional education set out in the Original
                  Undertaking, and to all Preceptors, Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and
                  Workplace Monitors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this 2016 Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        2016 Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of carrying out
                        his or her role and which he or she reasonably believes indicates a
                        potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 19, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Navdeep Mehta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 19, 2016:

Dr. Mehta entered into an Undertaking to the College on June 4, 2015 (the "Original Undertaking") as a result of a reassessment of his nephrology practice. Among other things Original Undertaking required monitoring of Dr. Mehta's behaviour in the workplace for a period of two years by a Workplace Monitor approved by the College. As a result of information received from his Workplace Monitor, Dr. Mehta has agreed to extend the period of time during which the Workplace Monitor will monitor his behaviour in the workplace to three years from the date of the Original Undertaking.