Mehta, Shamir (CPSO#: 64049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2631
Fax: 905-296-0086
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shamir Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 64049 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences - General Division
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMIR MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992