Mehta, Sunil Labhshanker (CPSO#: 68137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging
The Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: (905) 813-3042
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MyHealth Centre
Milton Diagnostic Imaging
Suite 212
480 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2X6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-8831
Fax: (905) 878-8832
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

MyHealth Centre
Credit Valley Imaging Associates
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-0653
Fax: (905) 828-0765
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sunil L Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 68137 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL LABHSHANKER MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999