Mendelssohn, Krisanne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 52996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Names: Knickle, Krisanne Elizabeth (used until: 16 Jul 2002 )     Mendelssohn, Krisanne Elizabeth (used until: 21 May 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 312
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-9055
Fax: (416) 281-9006
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. E. Mendelssohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mendelssohn ( CPSO# 52996 )

Business Address:
312 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 281-9055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISANNE ELIZABETH MENDELSSOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDELSSOHN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1984