Menikefs, Peter Nicholas (CPSO#: 69043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 4090
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

O C C
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 212-9359
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Menikefs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Menikefs ( CPSO# 69043 )

Business Address:
ReproMed
Suite 300
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W4
Phone Number: (416) 233-8111

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
O C C
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9359

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER NICHOLAS MENIKEFS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENIKEFS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000