Menon, Krishna (CPSO#: 66866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Professional Building
Suite 210
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 569-7789
Fax: (905) 569-7702
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishna Menon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Menon ( CPSO# 66866 )

Business Address:
210 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-7789

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHNA MENON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1997