Menon, Suresh (CPSO#: 99923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Calicut University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Division of Neurology
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44235
Fax: 905-577-8265
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suresh Menon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Menon ( CPSO# 99923 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2013 to 09 Apr 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Aug 2014 to 18 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Dec 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Suresh Menon may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Menon
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Menon  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Menon's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Menon's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 1, 2015, and expires on June 30,
                  2018.  Upon renewal of Dr. Menon's academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.