Mensour, Mark Samuel (CPSO#: 67936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville District Memorial
Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022
Fax: (705) 789-0557
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Mensour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mensour ( CPSO# 67936 )

Business Address:
35 Lake Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1E8
Phone Number: (705) 571-0636

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7

Business Address:
750 Scollard Street
North Bay ON  P1B 5A3

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK SAMUEL MENSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENSOUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996