Merali, Hasan Shamsh (CPSO#: 96678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Div of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7654
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Merali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Merali ( CPSO# 96678 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatric Emergency
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASAN SHAMSH MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014