Merali, Shamsh Yusuf (CPSO#: 27467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke FP&Walkin Medical Clinic
100 Humber College Blvd
Suite 106B
Etobicoke ON  M9V5G4
Phone: 416 742 6963
Fax: 416 742 6963
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mary Berglund CHC
HWY 599 & 17
Box 450
Ignace ON  P0T1T0
Canada
Phone: 807 934 2251
Fax: 807 934 6552
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shamsh Merali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merali ( CPSO# 27467 )

Business Address:
1100 Main Street
Box 450
Ignace ON  P0T 1T0

Medical Records Location

Address: For Oakville patients, requests should be forwarded to the same address that patients used to see Dr. Merali which is: Attention: Business Office Trafalgar Medical Clinic 1235 Trafalgar Road Oakville, ON L6H 3P1
Date Received: 22 Nov 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMSH YUSUF MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975