Mercer, Christopher Michael (CPSO#: 85759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF H Svcs Training Center
Canadian Forces Base Borden
PO Box 1000, Stn Main
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200 Ext. 2603
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

459 Hume St
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006