Meriano, Antonio Lorenzo (CPSO#: 70340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Room
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 985-2606
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.L. Meriano Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meriano ( CPSO# 70340 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Room
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 985-2606

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO LORENZO MERIANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERIANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998