Merritt, Richard Davidson (CPSO#: 23111)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard D. Merritt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking medical records of Dr. Merritt are to send a request to the office of Dr. Amber Sheikh (94301) at: Suite 305 4256 Portage Road Niagara Falls, ON L2E 6A4 Tel: (905) 358-6121
Date Received: 12 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013