Mersal, Ali Youssef (CPSO#: 66315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mersal Chilren clinic
688 Coxwell ave suite 312
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone: 416 465 2485
Fax: 647 342 3333
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pediatrics Urgent care
222 Dixon road
Etobicoke ON  M9B 3S5
Canada
Phone: 416 850 8947
Fax: 647 436 0591
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Mersal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mersal ( CPSO# 66315 )

Business Address:
312-688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 825-3716

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI YOUSSEF MERSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERSAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003