Meschino, Alfio (CPSO#: 52549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alfio Meschino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meschino ( CPSO# 52549 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFIO MESCHINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESCHINO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985