Meshrki, Hanan Shaker Daoud (CPSO#: 82055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 - 140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone: (905) 646-2444
Fax: (905) 646-9099
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Welland general hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

St Catharines general hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meshrki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Meshrki ( CPSO# 82055 )

Business Address:
105 - 140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone Number: (905) 646-2444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANAN SHAKER DAOUD MESHRKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESHRKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2005