Meyer, Jeffrey Hugh (CPSO#: 66631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PET Imaging Centre Ground Floor
C A M H
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34007
Fax: (416) 260-4188
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Stokes St.
Bell Gateway Building
Queen St., CAMH
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 34007
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY HUGH MEYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998