Meyers, Brandon Matthew (CPSO#: 84394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandon M. Meyers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Meyers ( CPSO# 84394 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON MATTHEW MEYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010