Mezhericher-Shenderey, Inna (CPSO#: 99259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
31 Disera Drve
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone: (905) 771-7755
Fax: (905) 771-7752
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Shenderey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mezhericher-Shenderey ( CPSO# 99259 )
Dr. A. Shenderey ( CPSO# 78848 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INNA MEZHERICHER-SHENDEREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEZHERICHER-SHENDEREY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013