Middlebrook, Paul Francis (CPSO#: 54322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
345 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1L3
Phone: (519) 372-0755
Fax: (226) 664-5555
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul F. Middlebrook, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Middlebrook ( CPSO# 54322 )

Business Address:
Greystone Office and Medical Center
205 - 345 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1L3
Phone Number: (519) 372-0755

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 09 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL FRANCIS MIDDLEBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDDLEBROOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985